MA H1713 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide that every child have the same rights and protections under law as any other child without regard to the marital status, gender, gender identity, or sexual orientation of the parent or parents. The Judiciary.
Title
To ensure legal parentage equality
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S947 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1713 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1713.pdf |