MA S928 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require that eminent domain takings be for public use purposes and defining the term public use. The Judiciary.
Title
Requiring that eminent domain be for the public use and defining public use
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S14 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - No further action
H62 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - No further action
H2707 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2294 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2304 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H62 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - No further action
H2707 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H2294 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2304 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S928 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S928.pdf |