MA S922 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to level-three sex offender residency restrictions. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to level-three sex offender residency restrictions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-11-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S923 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S717 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S738 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S1827 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S931 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S932 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H744 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H919 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H837 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3501 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S717 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S738 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S1827 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S931 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S932 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H744 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H919 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H837 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3501 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S922 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S922.pdf |