MA S923 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a special commission relative to the uniformity of sex offender residency restrictions in the Commonwealth. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a special commission relative to the uniformity of sex offender residency restrictions in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-16JointHearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S194 (Similar To) 2017-05-26 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 428
S487 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1153 (Similar To) 2017-10-24 - Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S1688 (Similar To) 2017-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S950 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S872 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S1119 (Similar To) 2017-06-01 - Accompanied H1110
H984 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H3944 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H4086 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback