MA S916 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2204
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to CORI reform. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to CORI reform
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2204 |
2015-09-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S1009 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S872 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2444
S812 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S995 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S982 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S980 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported adversely by committee
S1003 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
S2416 (Similar To) 2016-07-13 - Reprinted as amended, see S2434
S1009 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S872 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2444
S812 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S995 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S982 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S980 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported adversely by committee
S1003 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
S2416 (Similar To) 2016-07-13 - Reprinted as amended, see S2434
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S916 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S916.pdf |