MA S899 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to advance hate-crime protections for victims who are targeted due to their gender. The Judiciary.
Title
To advance hate-crime protections for victims who are targeted due to their gender
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S957 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S49 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H119 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1190 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4664
H774 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2281 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2377 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - New draft substituted, see S2562
H4664 (Similar To) 2018-08-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
S49 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H119 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1190 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4664
H774 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2281 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2377 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - New draft substituted, see S2562
H4664 (Similar To) 2018-08-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S899 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S899.pdf |