MA S2377 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4499
Note: Legislation replaced by S2562
Note: Legislation replaced by S2562
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-28 - New draft substituted, see S2562
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-28 - New draft substituted, see S2562
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to gender identity on Massachusetts identification. Transportation.
Title
Relative to gender identity on Massachusetts identification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2562 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read second |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for immediate consideration on Thursday, June 21, 2018 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2562 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Accompanied by H4499 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-03-26 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2337 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2436
H188 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4384
H386 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H363 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1190 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4664
S1375 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4499 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied S2377
S2562 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4664 (Similar To) 2018-08-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H188 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4384
H386 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H363 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1190 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4664
S1375 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4499 (Replaces) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied S2377
S2562 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4664 (Similar To) 2018-08-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2377 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2377.pdf |