MA S87 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H129

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-05 - Accompanied H129
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide equal access to evaluations for children with disabilities. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide equal access to evaluations for children with disabilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-05HouseAccompanied H129
2015-07-10JointHearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2015-07-10JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2015-07-08JointHearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H129 (Replaced by) 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H396 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H393 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S263 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S674 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
H415 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H96 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H344 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H87 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback