MA S866 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt dog training areas from civil or criminal action relating to noise pollution. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to dog training areas in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-08-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1500 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1492 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1656 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1513 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1613 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2160
S1671 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1487 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3906
H1518 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1605 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1521 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3343 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1607 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3693 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4004
H1606 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4215
H1569 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S2160 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - New draft substituted, see S2364
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1492 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1656 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1513 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1613 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2160
S1671 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1487 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3906
H1518 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1605 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1521 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3343 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1607 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3693 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4004
H1606 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4215
H1569 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S2160 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - New draft substituted, see S2364
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S866 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S866.pdf |