MA S865 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve municipal access to general existing housing data. Housing.
Title
Improving municipal access to general existing housing data
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S904 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H81 (Similar To) 2023-07-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H1349 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H2223 (Similar To) 2023-09-25 - Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H4360 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H81 (Similar To) 2023-07-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H1349 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
H2223 (Similar To) 2023-09-25 - Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H4360 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S865 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S865.pdf |