MA S859 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to right of first refusal in the event of foreclosure and short sales and deeds in lieu. The Judiciary.
Title
Regarding right of first refusal in the event of foreclosure and short sales and deeds in lieu
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S726 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2402
S948 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S841 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1128 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S903 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S500 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S716 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Reported from the committee on Senate Rules and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S948 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S841 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1128 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S903 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S500 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S716 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Reported from the committee on Senate Rules and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S859 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S859.pdf |