MA S500 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to alternatives to foreclosure. Financial Services.
Title
To equity law to foreclosure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2496 |
2017-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S474 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2799 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H328 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4128
H3329 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H805 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H794 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S841 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S903 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2349 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2336 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3059 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2496 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2799 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H328 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4128
H3329 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H805 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H794 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S841 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S903 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2349 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2336 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3059 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2496 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S500 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S500.pdf |