MA H328 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to implement alternatives to arrest for non-violent and verbal student misconduct. Education.
Title
Decriminalizing non-violent and verbal student misconduct
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4128 |
2017-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1146 (Similar To) 2017-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S842 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S876 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S312 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2384
H819 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H990 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H3499 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4128 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S842 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S876 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S312 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2384
H819 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H990 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H3499 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4128 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H328 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H328.pdf |