MA S858 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1708
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish uniform wage compliance and recordkeeping. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Establishing uniform wage compliance and record keeping
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-08-14 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-08-05 | House | Enacted |
2014-07-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-07-24 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #414 [Yeas 38 - Nays 0] |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Read third |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Accompanied by H1708 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Accompanied by H1708 |
2013-05-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2013 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1708 (Replaces) 2014-03-19 - Accompanied S858
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S858 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S858.pdf |