MA S850 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to strengthen the identity law. The Judiciary.
Title
Strengthening identity law
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] | Rep. James Miceli [D] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S100 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S130 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Report amended by substitution of bill, see S2304
H1861 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3893 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S130 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Report amended by substitution of bill, see S2304
H1861 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3893 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S850 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S850.pdf |