MA S847 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2811
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2811
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2811
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a community college campus hunger pilot program. Higher Education.
Title
Establishing a community college campus hunger pilot program
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Lovely [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2811 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1220 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S1221 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1358 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - Accompanied S833
H1968 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
H1346 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2814
S833 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2811 (Replaced by) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1620 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1221 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1358 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - Accompanied S833
H1968 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
H1346 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2814
S833 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2811 (Replaced by) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1620 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S847 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S847.pdf |