MA S1221 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand the community college training incentive program. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Expanding the community college training incentive program
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-07-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 10:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S847 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2811
S1220 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
H1358 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - Accompanied S833
H1968 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
H1346 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2814
S833 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1220 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
H1358 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - Accompanied S833
H1968 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
H1346 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2814
S833 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1221 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1221.pdf |