MA S839 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2814
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2814
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2814
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a behavioral health workforce center. Higher Education.
Title
Establishing a behavioral health workforce center
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2814 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H1244 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H1240 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H2099 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1291 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S776 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1287 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1295 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2920
S781 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1302
S2814 (Replaced by) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1346 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2814
H1244 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H1240 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H2099 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1291 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S776 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1287 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1295 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2920
S781 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1302
S2814 (Replaced by) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1346 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2814
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S839 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S839.pdf |