MA S828 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the rights of faculty members at the University of Massachusetts. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the rights of faculty members at the University of Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-01SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2023-06-21JointHearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H4552 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2024 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1
H4750 (Similar To) 2024-06-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback