MA S818 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to credit for good conduct. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to credit for good conduct
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S576 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1575 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S585 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1636 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1637 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1664 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1610 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
S1611 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
H1485 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1626 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied S1184
S577 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H4229 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see H4232
H4241 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4806
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1575 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S585 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1636 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1637 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1664 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1610 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
S1611 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
H1485 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1626 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied S1184
S577 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H4229 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see H4232
H4241 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4806
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S818 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S818.pdf |