MA S793 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
For legislation relative to the appointment of town managers
Title
For legislation relative to the appointment of town managers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-26 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-08-26 | Rules suspended | |
2010-08-26 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | |
2010-07-29 | Read; and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2010-07-28 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-28 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-28 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | |
2010-03-15 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee On Ethics and Rules | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 8/11 at 10:00 AM in Hearing Room A2 | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/s00793.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/senate/186/st00/st00793.htm |