MA S789 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2313

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to traffic and pedestrian stop data. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to traffic and pedestrian stop data

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2313
2017-10-10JointHearing scheduled for 10/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S860 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1905 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2362
H2779 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2017
H2416 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H916 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2506 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1917 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1883 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback