MA S1905 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2362

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to reduce traffic fatalities. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To reduce traffic fatalities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2362
2018-02-07SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Friday March 2, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-06-07JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S2092 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2103
H1867 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H2877 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4421
H3129 (Similar To) 2017-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S2106 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - See S2092
S2362 (Replaced by) 2018-06-29 - Amendment # () adopted
H4421 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2570 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Reprinted as amended, see S2584
S2584 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback