MA S771 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H750
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 435 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 435 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve juror service. The Judiciary.
Title
Improving juror service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 435 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-28 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-12-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-12-28 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-12-13 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Accompanied by H750 |
2017-04-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S793 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S101 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S642 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1865 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H862 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H610 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H591 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H3040 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H750 (Replaces) 2018-04-05 - Accompanied S771
S101 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S642 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1865 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H862 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H610 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H591 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H3040 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H750 (Replaces) 2018-04-05 - Accompanied S771
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S771 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S771.pdf |