MA H610 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4605
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the improvement of primary care in the Commonwealth. Health Care Financing.
Title
To improve primary care in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Honan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4605 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 13, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-05-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S101 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1865 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S771 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 435 of the Acts of 2018
S642 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H591 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H3040 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4605 (Replaced by) 2018-06-19 - New draft substituted, see H4617
S1865 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S771 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 435 of the Acts of 2018
S642 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H591 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H3040 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4605 (Replaced by) 2018-06-19 - New draft substituted, see H4617
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H610 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H610.pdf |