MA S756 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H1202
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Accompanied H1202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Accompanied H1202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to preserve special needs trusts for disabled seniors. Health Care Financing.
Title
Preserving special needs trusts for disabled seniors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-30 | House | Accompanied H1202 |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-05-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1202 (Replaced by) 2024-07-10 - New draft substituted, see H4841
S887 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S887 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S756 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S756.pdf |