MA H1202 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S756
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the disposal of resources for determining eligibility for Medicaid. Health Care Financing.
Title
To preserve special needs trusts for disabled seniors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-10-30 | House | Accompanied by S756 |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-05-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S756 (Replaces) 2023-10-30 - Accompanied H1202
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1202 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1202.pdf |