MA S742 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1268
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1268
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to stabilize the Commonwealth’s nursing facilities. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to stabilizing the Commonwealth’s nursing facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | House | Accompanied H1268 |
2021-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1268 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S763 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S762
S399 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S763 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S762
S399 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S742 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S742.pdf |