MA S70 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H140

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to abusive practices to change sexual orientation and gender identity in minors. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to abusive practices to change sexual orientation and gender identity in minors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H140
2019-03-25SenateAccompanied H140
2019-03-11SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2019-03-05JointHearing scheduled for 03/05/2019 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-03-05JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2019-03-01JointHearing scheduled for 03/05/2019 from 02:45 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-03-01JointHearing scheduled for 03/05/2019 from 11:30 AM-02:45 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H3070 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1478 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3458 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1536 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S976 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1495 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1265 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1333 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H140 (Replaced by) 2019-04-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2019
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback