MA H140 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S70
Note: Legislation replaced by S2189

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 113-4)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to abusive practices to change sexual orientation and gender identity in minors. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to abusive practices to change sexual orientation and gender identity in minors

Sponsors

Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]
Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]
Sen. William Brownsberger [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]
Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Sen. Cynthia Creem [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Mark Cusack [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]
Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]
Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]
Sen. Barry Finegold [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Sen. Cindy Friedman [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Thomas Golden [D]
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]
Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Sen. Eric Lesser [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]
Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Aaron Michlewitz [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]
Sen. Mark Montigny [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]
Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]
Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. David Vieira [R]
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Sen. James Welch [D]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]
Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]

Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #17 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 31 (Y: 148 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 30 (Y: 149 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House "Shall the decision of chair stand" Yea and Nay No. 29 (Y: 125 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House "Shall the decision of chair stand" Yea and Nay No. 28 (Y: 125 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2019
2019-04-04SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2019-04-04HouseEnacted
2019-04-04SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2019-04-04HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2019-04-04SenateSenate concurred in the further House amendment
2019-04-04SenateRules suspended
2019-04-04HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment
2019-04-01HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2019-03-28SenatePassed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #17 (Yeas 34 to Nays 0)
2019-03-28SenateReprinted as amended, S2191
2019-03-28SenateRead third
2019-03-28SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-03-28SenateAmended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2187, amended
2019-03-28SenateOpinions requested, negatived, see S2189
2019-03-28SenateRead second
2019-03-25SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2019
2019-03-25SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2019-03-25SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2019 with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2187
2019-03-18SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2019-03-13HousePassed to be engrossed - 148 YEAS to 8 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 31)
2019-03-13HouseMotion to reconsider prevailed
2019-03-13HousePassed to be engrossed - 149 YEAS to 8 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 30)
2019-03-13HouseDecision of Chair stands - 125 YEAS to 33 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 29)
2019-03-13HouseLaid aside on point of order
2019-03-13HouseAmendment 2 pending
2019-03-13HouseDecision of Chair stands - 125 YEAS to 33 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 28)
2019-03-13HouseLaid aside on point of order
2019-03-13HouseAmendment 1 pending
2019-03-13HouseRead third
2019-03-13HouseRules suspended
2019-03-13HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-03-13HouseRules suspended
2019-03-13HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-03-13HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-03-11HouseCommittee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-03-05JointHearing scheduled for 03/05/2019 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-03-05JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2019-03-01JointHearing scheduled for 03/05/2019 from 02:45 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-03-01JointHearing scheduled for 03/05/2019 from 11:30 AM-02:45 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

S70 (Replaces) 2019-04-01 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H140
S2189 (Replaced by) 2019-03-29 - Placed on file
S976 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1495 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1478 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1265 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H3458 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback