MA S699 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H1011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H1011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to fair and equitable compensation for medical services. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to fair and equitable compensation for medical services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Accompanied H1011 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-08-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S1324 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2647
S1518 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
H1011 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1997 (Similar To) 2023-11-30 - Hearing scheduled for 12/04/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1518 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
H1011 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1997 (Similar To) 2023-11-30 - Hearing scheduled for 12/04/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S699 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S699.pdf |