MA H1997 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4712

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4712
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further define medical necessity determinations. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To further define medical necessity determinations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-06HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4712
2023-11-30JointHearing scheduled for 12/04/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

S2739 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2795
H4712 (Replaced by) 2024-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback