MA S690 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2235

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the endowment match program. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the endowment match program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-14SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2235
2017-06-26JointHearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:30 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

S1533 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1944 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2435
H641 (Similar To) 2017-12-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2235
H2178 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2235 (Replaced by) 2017-12-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback