MA S69 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2662
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2662
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2662
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to facilitate the unionization of the cannabis workforce. Cannabis Policy.
Title
To facilitate the unionization of the cannabis workforce
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2662 |
2021-11-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
Same As/Similar To
H3710 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4545
H213 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2662 (Replaced by) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4545 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H213 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2662 (Replaced by) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4545 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S69 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S69.pdf |