MA H213 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to making foster parents public employees and providing them with certain collective bargaining rights. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To assure quality foster care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-11-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S109 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
H204 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Accompanied H212
H212 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H256 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3710 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4545
S69 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2662
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
H204 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Accompanied H212
H212 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H256 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3710 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4545
S69 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2662
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H213 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H213.pdf |