MA S676 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2538
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to MassHealth provider reimbursement. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to MassHealth provider reimbursement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2538 |
2019-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-04-08 | House | House concurred |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Education |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H598 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S730 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H405 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H1128 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1149 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1161 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1861 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1679 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2795
S50 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S661 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2834 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S251 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S2538 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S730 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H405 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H1128 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1149 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1161 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1861 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1679 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2795
S50 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S661 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2834 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S251 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S2538 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S676 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S676.pdf |