MA S664 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4634

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to public health dental hygienists. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the sustainability of public health dental hygienists through adequate reimbursements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4634
2024-03-11SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2023-11-21JointHearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S798 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S790 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4620
H1179 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4620
H4634 (Replaced by) 2024-05-09 - Reported, in part, by H962

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback