MA S587 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2356

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to evidence of coverage to be delivered to covered adults by health, dental and vision care providers. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to administrative simplification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2356
2015-09-09JointHearing scheduled for 09/22/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S2356 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S362 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2316
S521 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
H879 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
S82 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382
H898 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
S459 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S405 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S438 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S436 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S410 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback