MA S581 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2734
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to privately operated animal shelters and rescue organizations. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to privately operated animal shelters and rescue organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2734 |
2021-11-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S2087 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2734 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2132 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2734 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2132 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S581 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S581.pdf |