MA S56 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to creating a loan repayment program for human service workers. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to creating a loan repayment program for human service workers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14JointHearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H1248 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2553 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1196 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S160 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1749 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1077 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H163 (Similar To) 2019-05-14 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback