MA H163 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-8)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a loan repayment program for certain human service workers. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a loan repayment program for human service workers

Sponsors

Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]
Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Christopher Markey [D]
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]
Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]
Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Thomas Golden [D]
Rep. James Murphy [D]Rep. Todd Smola [R]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]
Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]
Sen. James Eldridge [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Claire Cronin [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]
Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. David Nangle [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]
Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]
Rep. Frank Moran [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14JointHearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H1171 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1196 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S56 (Similar To) 2019-05-14 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S1077 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H156 (Similar To) 2019-05-14 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S1649 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback