MA S548 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to crumbling concrete foundations. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to crumbling concrete foundations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-10SenateSenate concurred
2022-03-01HouseReporting date extended to Thursday March 31, 2022, pending concurrence
2022-02-10SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-07HouseReporting date extended to Monday February 28, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-12-28JointHearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 01:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S2358 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2092 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1882 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2804 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4849 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2022 from 10:30 AM-11:00 AM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback