MA S2804 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S548
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9-1-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to crumbling concrete foundations, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2804).
Title
Addressing crumbling concrete foundations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-04-04 | Senate | New draft of S548 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S548 (Replaces) 2022-03-10 - Senate concurred
S2358 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2092 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H4849 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1882 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2358 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2092 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H4849 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1882 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2804 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2804.pdf |