MA S542 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Underground Storage Tank Petroleum Cleanup Fund Administrative Review Board. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the Underground Storage Tank Petroleum Cleanup Fund Administrative Review Board
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H2212 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
H1777 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1054 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
H1777 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1054 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S542 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S542.pdf |