MA S518 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require health care coverage for medically necessary treatment for certain students. Financial Services.
Title
To require health care coverage for medically necessary treatment for certain students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2496 |
2017-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S554 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S527 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2471
S1086 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2282
H607 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H642 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H518 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2496 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S554 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S527 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2471
S1086 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2282
H607 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H642 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H518 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2496 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S518 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S518.pdf |