MA S515 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2318
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require insurers to report malpractice claims or actions for optometrists. Financial Services.
Title
Requiring insurers to report malpractice claims for optometrists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2318 |
2015-11-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 01:00 AM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S2318 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S435 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S455 (Similar To) 2015-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1214 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S630 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S489 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S435 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S455 (Similar To) 2015-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1214 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S630 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S489 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S515 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S515.pdf |