MA S491 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the timely disposal of contraband drugs. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the timely disposal of contraband drugs
Sponsors
Sen. James Timilty [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S485 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S465 (Similar To) 2017-09-14 - Accompanied S478
S443 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied H2946
H2074 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H3528 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3548 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H392 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H424 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H434 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H436 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H1224 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3927 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
S465 (Similar To) 2017-09-14 - Accompanied S478
S443 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied H2946
H2074 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H3528 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3548 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H392 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H424 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H434 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H436 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H1224 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3927 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S491 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S491.pdf |