MA H392 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4550
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to local on-site sewage disposal systems. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to local on-site sewage disposal systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4550 |
2017-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S466 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1172 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H4550 (Replaced by) 2018-05-31 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1172 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H4550 (Replaced by) 2018-05-31 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H392 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H392.pdf |