MA S484 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2489
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to restore the public trust for tidelands. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To restore the public trust for tidelands
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2489 |
2017-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S23 (Similar To) 2017-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2017
S148 (Similar To) 2017-07-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S480 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2183
S117 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S161 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S458 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
H2002 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1298 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1919 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H3897 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2017
H28 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4351
H3954 (Similar To) 2017-10-16 - See H3754
H4254 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4429
H4255 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4430
S2489 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
S148 (Similar To) 2017-07-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S480 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2183
S117 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S161 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S458 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
H2002 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1298 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1919 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H3897 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2017
H28 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4351
H3954 (Similar To) 2017-10-16 - See H3754
H4254 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4429
H4255 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4430
S2489 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S484 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S484.pdf |