MA S23 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to grant 9 additional licenses to the town of Wrentham for the sale of alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Wrentham to grant 9 additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-26 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2017
2017-09-18SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2017-09-18HouseEnacted
2017-09-14SenateSenate concurred in the House amendment
2017-09-14SenateRules suspended
2017-09-07HouseRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2017-08-17HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-08-17HouseRules suspended
2017-08-17HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2017-08-07HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-08-03SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2017-08-03SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2017-06-29SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-06-19SenateBill reported favorably by committee and place in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2017-05-03JointHearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2017-02-21HouseHouse concurred
2017-02-21SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback